NY S01047 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-25 - SIGNED CHAP.8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits discrimination based on gender identity or expression; defines "gender identity or expression" as having or being perceived as having a gender identity, self image, appearance, behavior or expression whether or not that gender identity, self image, appearance, behavior or expression is different from that traditionally associated with the sex assigned to that person at birth; further includes offenses regarding gender identity or expression within the list of offenses subject to treatment as hate crimes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits discrimination based on gender identity or expression; defines "gender identity or expression" as having or being perceived as having a gender identity, self image, appearance, behavior or expression whether or not that gender identity, self image, appearance, behavior or expression is different from that traditionally associated with the sex assigned to that person at birth; further includes offenses regarding gender identity or expression within the list of offenses subject to treatment as hate crimes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 105 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-25AssemblySIGNED CHAP.8
2019-01-15SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-01-15Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-01-15Assemblypassed assembly
2019-01-15Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.2
2019-01-15Assemblysubstituted for a747
2019-01-15Assemblyreferred to codes
2019-01-15SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-01-15SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-01-14SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2
2019-01-14SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-01-10SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A00747 (Same As) 2019-01-15 - substituted by s1047

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback