NY S01039 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-22 - VETOED MEMO.129
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-22 - VETOED MEMO.129
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides procedures to be followed in appointing a hearing officer for removal and disciplinary action against certain public employees not in the service of the city of New York, including the fees to be paid for such hearing officer; provides for suspension, with pay, pending the determination.
Title
Provides procedures to be followed in appointing a hearing officer for removal and disciplinary action against certain public employees not in the service of the city of New York, including the fees to be paid for such hearing officer; provides for suspension, with pay, pending the determination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 109 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-22 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.129 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.620 |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a3748a |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1795 |
2023-06-08 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1039A |
2023-05-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2023-05-17 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A03748 (Same As) 2023-06-10 - substituted by s1039a