NY S01034 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2681B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prevents occupational exposure to an airborne infectious disease by implementing a model infectious disease exposure prevention standard and requiring employers to implement such model or a similar plan; provides that where an action brought by an employee under the provisions of this section, or a defense, counterclaim, or crossclaim brought by an employer in response thereto, is found upon judgment to be completely without merit in law and undertaken primarily to harass or maliciously injure another, the court may in its discretion impose sanctions against the attorney or party who brought such action, defense, counterclaim or crossclaim; makes related provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prevents occupational exposure to an airborne infectious disease by implementing a model infectious disease exposure prevention standard and requiring employers to implement such model or a similar plan; provides that where an action brought by an employee under the provisions of this section, or a defense, counterclaim, or crossclaim brought by an employer in response thereto, is found upon judgment to be completely without merit in law and undertaken primarily to harass or maliciously injure another, the court may in its discretion impose sanctions against the attorney or party who brought such action, defense, counterclaim or crossclaim; makes related provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-20SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A2681B
2021-04-19SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 1034B
2021-04-19SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2021-04-19Senatereturned to senate
2021-04-19AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2021-03-01Assemblyreferred to labor
2021-03-01SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-03-01SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-02-22SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 1034A
2021-01-25SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2021-01-20Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2021-01-19Senate1ST REPORT CAL.119
2021-01-06SenateREFERRED TO LABOR

Same As/Similar To

A02681 (Same As) 2021-05-05 - approval memo.7

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback