NY S01032 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Ulster county sheriff to serve as an additional firearms licensing officer.
Title
Authorizes the Ulster county sheriff to serve as an additional firearms licensing officer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2018-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1527 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1384 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A01267 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to codes