NY S01031 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes various provisions regulating the location of environmental facilities to insure equity of treatment for minority communities or economically distressed areas or disadvantaged communities; requires environmental impact statements to state whether the siting of a facility will cause or increase a disproportionate burden on such areas.
Title
Makes various provisions regulating the location of environmental facilities to insure equity of treatment for minority communities or economically distressed areas or disadvantaged communities; requires environmental impact statements to state whether the siting of a facility will cause or increase a disproportionate burden on such areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-03-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-03-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.732 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1031C |
2022-03-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-03-03 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2021-03-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.334 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1031B |
2021-02-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2021-02-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1031A |
2021-02-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02103 (Same As) 2022-04-25 - substituted by s8830