NY S01021 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-07 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-07 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the board of education of any school district in the state to enter into a contract for the sale of advertising space on school athletic fields owned or leased by the school district; prohibits advertisements for tobacco or alcohol products or for political advocacy; requires prior approval of all advertisements by the local board of education; provides that revenue be retained by the school district making such contract; provides provisions do not apply to cities with a population of one million or more.
Title
Authorizes the board of education of any school district in the state to enter into a contract for the sale of advertising space on school athletic fields owned or leased by the school district; prohibits advertisements for tobacco or alcohol products or for political advocacy; requires prior approval of all advertisements by the local board of education; provides that revenue be retained by the school district making such contract; provides provisions do not apply to cities with a population of one million or more.
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. Philip Boyle [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] |
Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] | Sen. James Seward [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Assembly | referred to education |
2018-05-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.572 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.820 |
2017-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05020 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - held for consideration in education