NY S01016 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-05 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-05 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of health to develop informational materials concerning menstrual disorders for distribution in schools and to patients.
Title
Directs the commissioner of health to develop informational materials concerning menstrual disorders for distribution in schools and to patients.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2019-04-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A00484 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - signed chap.534