NY S01016 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-05 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-05 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the crime of environmental damage of property.
Title
Creates the crime of environmental damage of property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2014-03-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-03-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-02-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-02-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.131 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2013-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.629 |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |