NY S00995 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.91
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.91
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the disclosure of beneficial owners of limited liability companies and foreign limited liability companies and certain information about such beneficial owners; requires the secretary of state to maintain a public database of all business entities organized in the state and all foreign business entities with authority to do business in the state.
Title
Relates to the disclosure of beneficial owners of limited liability companies and foreign limited liability companies and certain information about such beneficial owners; requires the secretary of state to maintain a public database of all business entities organized in the state and all foreign business entities with authority to do business in the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-22 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.91 |
2023-12-22 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.772 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.753 |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a3484a |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1622 |
2023-06-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 995B |
2023-05-23 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2023-04-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 995A |
2023-04-28 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2023-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A03484 (Same As) 2023-06-09 - substituted by s995b