NY S00983 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the authority of the commissioner of general services to lease public buildings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the authority of the commissioner of general services to lease public buildings.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2020-02-12Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2020-02-11Senate1ST REPORT CAL.407
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-02-12SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-02-11Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-02-05Senate1ST REPORT CAL.131
2019-01-09SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A03832 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.154

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback