NY S00968 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires service providers to annually submit an emergency response plan to the public service commission for review; authorizes the public service commission to require the service provider amend the plan; authorizes the commission to open an investigation to review the performance of service providers in meeting the requirements of the emergency response plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires service providers to annually submit an emergency response plan to the public service commission for review; authorizes the public service commission to require the service provider amend the plan; authorizes the commission to open an investigation to review the performance of service providers in meeting the requirements of the emergency response plan.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-16Assemblyreferred to codes
2022-05-16SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2022-05-16SenateREPASSED SENATE
2022-05-09SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 968A
2022-05-09SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2022-05-09Assemblyreturned to senate
2022-05-09SenateRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2022-03-23Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions
2022-03-23SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2022-03-23SenatePASSED SENATE
2022-02-17SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2022-02-16Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2022-02-15Senate1ST REPORT CAL.520
2022-01-05SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
2022-01-05Assemblyreturned to senate
2022-01-05Assemblydied in assembly
2021-02-23Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions
2021-02-23SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-02-23SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-02-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2021-02-03Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2021-02-02Senate1ST REPORT CAL.249
2021-01-06SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A02622 (Same As) 2022-05-17 - reported referred to rules

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback