NY S00962 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the establishment of a state university-based center for employee ownership that provides education and outreach to business owners regarding employee ownership.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the establishment of a state university-based center for employee ownership that provides education and outreach to business owners regarding employee ownership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-03Assemblyreferred to economic development
2024-06-03SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-06-03SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-05-30SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1555
2024-05-30SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2024-02-28SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-05-30Assemblyreferred to economic development
2023-05-30SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-05-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-05-22SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1072
2023-05-22SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-01-25SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2023-01-09SenateREFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS

Same As/Similar To

A01920 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to economic development

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback