NY S00956 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-22 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Parks, Arts and Sports Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-22 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Parks, Arts and Sports Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits littering on state park lands.
Title
Prohibits littering on state park lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2016-03-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-03-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-02-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-02-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.70 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2015-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.846 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |