NY S00952 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides an exemption to the retail sale of plug-in hybrid electric vehicles from state sales and compensating use taxes; authorizes local governments to adopt similar incentives.
Title
Provides an exemption to the retail sale of plug-in hybrid electric vehicles from state sales and compensating use taxes; authorizes local governments to adopt similar incentives.
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 952A |
2018-01-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-02-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09587 (Same As) 2018-01-24 - referred to ways and means