NY S00946 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-11 - APPROVAL MEMO.11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Waives New York state application fees for all veterans who were honorably discharged or released under honorable circumstances from such service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Waives New York state application fees for all veterans who were honorably discharged or released under honorable circumstances from such service.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-11AssemblyAPPROVAL MEMO.11
2017-11-11AssemblySIGNED CHAP.404
2017-11-09SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2017-06-21Assemblyreturned to senate
2017-06-21Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-21Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.640
2017-06-21Assemblysubstituted for a1105b
2017-06-19Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2017-06-19AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-19SenateREPASSED SENATE
2017-06-06SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 946A
2017-06-06SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2017-06-06Senatereturned to senate
2017-06-06AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2017-03-27Assemblyreferred to governmental employees
2017-03-27SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-03-27SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-01-30SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-01-24Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-01-23Senate1ST REPORT CAL.50
2017-01-05SenateREFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS

Same As/Similar To

A01105 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - substituted by s946a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00946&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00946&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00946
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00946&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00946A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S946#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S946#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S946#SF2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00946&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback