NY S00943 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the healthy options and community outreach program; directs the empire state development corporation to conduct a public awareness campaign; establishes tax credits for small grocers and convenience stores participating in the program.
Title
Establishes the healthy options and community outreach program; directs the empire state development corporation to conduct a public awareness campaign; establishes tax credits for small grocers and convenience stores participating in the program.
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1089 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 943A |
2018-05-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2018-02-13 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2017-03-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.442 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-02-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A03944 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to agriculture