NY S00933 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates certain substances as schedule I opiates controlled substances; includes within the offenses of criminal sale of a controlled substance in the second and first degrees, the sale of certain amounts of preparations, compounds, mixtures or substances containing heroin and schedule I opiates.
Title
Designates certain substances as schedule I opiates controlled substances; includes within the offenses of criminal sale of a controlled substance in the second and first degrees, the sale of certain amounts of preparations, compounds, mixtures or substances containing heroin and schedule I opiates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-04-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.861 |
2018-04-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-04-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 933B |
2018-04-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-08 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2017-05-01 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 933A |
2017-05-01 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-01 | Senate | returned to senate |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | referred to health |
2017-04-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-04-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.383 |
2017-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07365 (Same As) 2017-04-25 - referred to health