NY S00931 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-31 - PRINT NUMBER 931A
Pending: Senate Women's Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-31 - PRINT NUMBER 931A
Pending: Senate Women's Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits health care practitioners from performing a virginity examination or supervising the performance of a virginity examination on a patient; defines "virginity examination".
Title
Prohibits health care practitioners from performing a virginity examination or supervising the performance of a virginity examination on a patient; defines "virginity examination".
Sponsors
Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] | Sen. Nathalia Fernandez [D] | Sen. Michelle Hinchey [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 931A |
2024-05-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
2023-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
Same As/Similar To
A00128 (Same As) 2024-06-03 - amended on third reading 128a