NY S00929 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides a reimbursement to small businesses and residential consumers of certain utilities for failure to provide contracted services; requires the Long Island power authority to do the same.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides a reimbursement to small businesses and residential consumers of certain utilities for failure to provide contracted services; requires the Long Island power authority to do the same.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions
2021-02-23SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-02-23SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-02-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2021-02-03Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2021-02-03SenateAMENDED 929B
2021-02-02Senate1ST REPORT CAL.248
2021-01-27SenatePRINT NUMBER 929A
2021-01-27SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
2021-01-06SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A03044 (Same As) 2021-02-16 - print number 3044a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback