NY S00927 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that vehicles with permits for handicapped parking issued anywhere in the state may use all spaces for handicapped parking in the city of New York.
Title
Provides that vehicles with permits for handicapped parking issued anywhere in the state may use all spaces for handicapped parking in the city of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-19 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2012-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-05-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.775 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |