NY S00913 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO AGING
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO AGING
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to informal caregiver training; defines "person in need of assistance"; expands who may serve as an "informal caregiver".
Title
Relates to informal caregiver training; defines "person in need of assistance"; expands who may serve as an "informal caregiver".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | referred to aging |
2021-03-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.190 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A06914 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means