NY S00907 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.530
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.530
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits state employees to be excused from work without loss of compensation for up to four hours to donate blood; permits supervisor to require proof of such donation.
Title
Permits state employees to be excused from work without loss of compensation for up to four hours to donate blood; permits supervisor to require proof of such donation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-17 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.530 |
2022-08-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.522 |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | substituted for a1871 |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-03-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.344 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-01-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 907A |
2021-01-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A01871 (Same As) 2022-05-03 - substituted by s907a