NY S00906 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION
Pending: Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION
Pending: Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a blue ribbon commission on fair competition in the outdoor recreation industry to examine, evaluate and make recommendations regarding methods to promote fair competition in the outdoor recreation industry; provides such commission shall consist of eleven appointed members; requires a report to the governor and legislature on or before December 31, 2018.
Title
Establishes a blue ribbon commission on fair competition in the outdoor recreation industry to examine, evaluate and make recommendations regarding methods to promote fair competition in the outdoor recreation industry; provides such commission shall consist of eleven appointed members; requires a report to the governor and legislature on or before December 31, 2018.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2017-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05031 (Same As) 2017-10-11 - enacting clause stricken