NY S00899 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - APPROVAL MEMO.24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - APPROVAL MEMO.24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the volunteer ambulance service award program to require a mandatory referendum for certain changes and authorizes a lowering of the entitlement to age 55.
Title
Changes the volunteer ambulance service award program to require a mandatory referendum for certain changes and authorizes a lowering of the entitlement to age 55.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-29 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.24 |
2017-11-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.426 |
2017-11-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.540 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a6873 |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2017-02-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-02-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-02-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.118 |
2017-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A03513 (Same As) 2017-03-08 - enacting clause stricken
A06873 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s899
A06873 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s899