NY S00897 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - SIGNED CHAP.130
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - SIGNED CHAP.130
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that certain schools shall experience no financial harm for their inability to operate for the full 180 session days due to the outbreak of coronavirus disease 2019 (COVID-19).
Title
Provides that certain schools shall experience no financial harm for their inability to operate for the full 180 session days due to the outbreak of coronavirus disease 2019 (COVID-19).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.130 |
2021-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.196 |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | substituted for a958 |
2021-01-25 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-01-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-01-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-01-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.50 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A00958 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - substituted by s897