NY S00894 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - SIGNED CHAP.73
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - SIGNED CHAP.73
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system as the "Major General Harold J. Greene Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system as the "Major General Harold J. Greene Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.73 |
2017-06-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.371 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a2031a |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 894A |
2017-06-05 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2017-06-05 | Senate | returned to senate |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2017-01-31 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-01-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-01-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-01-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.31 |
2017-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02031 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - substituted by s894a