NY S00870 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on December 30 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-30 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the city of Buffalo to provide by local law for the adjudication of traffic infractions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the city of Buffalo to provide by local law for the adjudication of traffic infractions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-30SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2014-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2014-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2014-06-19Assemblyhome rule request
2014-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.537
2014-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a3702c
2014-06-18Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2014-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2014-06-18SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2014-06-09SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2014-06-03Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2014-06-03SenateAMENDED 870C
2014-06-02Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1059
2014-04-29SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2014-01-08SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
2013-10-09SenatePRINT NUMBER 870B
2013-10-09SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES
2013-06-11SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2013-04-17SenatePRINT NUMBER 870A
2013-04-17SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2013-02-28SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2013-01-09SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A03702 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s870c

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00870&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00870&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00870
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00870&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00870A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00870&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00870B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00870&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00870C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00870&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback