NY S00856 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES
Pending: Senate Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES
Pending: Senate Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the creation of home stability support supplement programs.
Title
Relates to the creation of home stability support supplement programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2021-01-25 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A02278 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - enacting clause stricken
A06032 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to social services
A06032 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to social services