NY S00842 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies the offense of forcible touching by removing the element of the actor's intent, including the intent to degrade or abuse another person.
Title
Modifies the offense of forcible touching by removing the element of the actor's intent, including the intent to degrade or abuse another person.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-03-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.605 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A00208 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to codes