NY S00841 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - SIGNED CHAP.505
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Reduces emissions of air pollutants from petroleum bulk storage facilities by requiring that no person shall own or operate a facility containing an above-ground tank that does not have a shell color and roof color of either white or beige/cream; provides that such color requirements shall apply to every tank at a facility regardless of whether the tank is in active use for storage; defines terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reduces emissions of air pollutants from petroleum bulk storage facilities by requiring that no person shall own or operate a facility containing an above-ground tank that does not have a shell color and roof color of either white or beige/cream; provides that such color requirements shall apply to every tank at a facility regardless of whether the tank is in active use for storage; defines terms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-25SenateSIGNED CHAP.505
2021-10-13SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2021-06-10Assemblyreturned to senate
2021-06-10Assemblypassed assembly
2021-06-10Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.714
2021-06-10Assemblysubstituted for a6177a
2021-06-01Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation
2021-06-01SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-06-01SenateREPASSED SENATE
2021-05-25SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 841A
2021-05-25SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2021-05-25Assemblyreturned to senate
2021-05-25SenateRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2021-03-03Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation
2021-03-03SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-03-03SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-02-22SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2021-02-10Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2021-02-09Senate1ST REPORT CAL.332
2021-01-06SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION

Same As/Similar To

A06177 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - substituted by s841a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback