NY S00840 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-18 - SIGNED CHAP.246
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-18 - SIGNED CHAP.246
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to patients interred at state mental health hospital cemeteries; directs the release of the name, birthdate and date of death of certain patients 50 years after the date of death.
Title
Relates to patients interred at state mental health hospital cemeteries; directs the release of the name, birthdate and date of death of certain patients 50 years after the date of death.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.246 |
2016-08-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.777 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a6386a |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2016-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-02-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-02-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.227 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2015-05-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 840A |
2015-05-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2015-03-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2015-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A06386 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - substituted by s840a