NY S00834 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - PRINT NUMBER 834A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - PRINT NUMBER 834A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to rates of reimbursement for telehealth services; requires insurers to reimburse telehealth providers at the same rate as they would if the services had been provided in person.
Title
Relates to rates of reimbursement for telehealth services; requires insurers to reimburse telehealth providers at the same rate as they would if the services had been provided in person.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 834A |
2018-01-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2017-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A01421 (Same As) 2018-02-26 - print number 1421b