NY S00826 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the redaction of certain physician's names on birth certificates when such physician's license to practice medicine has been surrendered or revoked by the office of professional medical conduct.
Title
Permits the redaction of certain physician's names on birth certificates when such physician's license to practice medicine has been surrendered or revoked by the office of professional medical conduct.
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-02-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-02-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.443 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |