NY S00813 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2263
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2263
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the maximum age at which a homeless youth can continue to receive shelter services; raises the age from twenty-one to twenty-four.
Title
Relates to the maximum age at which a homeless youth can continue to receive shelter services; raises the age from twenty-one to twenty-four.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2263 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-02-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.424 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2021-04-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-04-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.263 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A02263 (Same As) 2022-12-28 - tabled