NY S00812 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - SIGNED CHAP.70
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends provisions for determination of eligibility for extended child care assistance benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends provisions for determination of eligibility for extended child care assistance benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-03SenateSIGNED CHAP.70
2023-03-03SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2023-02-08Assemblyreturned to senate
2023-02-08Assemblypassed assembly
2023-02-08Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.83
2023-02-08Assemblysubstituted for a982
2023-01-17Assemblyreferred to children and families
2023-01-17SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-01-17SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-01-09SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.21
2023-01-06SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A00982 (Same As) 2023-02-08 - substituted by s812

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback