NY S00809 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revives civil actions for certain sex offenses committed against a person less than eighteen years of age.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revives civil actions for certain sex offenses committed against a person less than eighteen years of age.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2017-04-20SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2017-03-02SenateNOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
2017-01-05SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback