NY S00793 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows persons 60 years or older to keep and care for common household pets in buildings operated by the New York city housing authority; prevents eviction of such persons based on the ownership of pets; provides that any pet who poses a nuisance to the community may be removed; does not remove any pet owner from liability for the reasonable costs directly attributable to any damage caused by the pet.
Title
Allows persons 60 years or older to keep and care for common household pets in buildings operated by the New York city housing authority; prevents eviction of such persons based on the ownership of pets; provides that any pet who poses a nuisance to the community may be removed; does not remove any pet owner from liability for the reasonable costs directly attributable to any damage caused by the pet.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2018-03-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.647 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-03-07 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2017-03-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.201 |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07141 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to housing