NY S00785 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-08 - PRINT NUMBER 785A
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-08 - PRINT NUMBER 785A
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the New York state task force on wind generating facilities siting and permitting policies to study the need to implement a uniform statewide policy regarding the siting and permitting of wind energy production facilities.
Title
Establishes the New York state task force on wind generating facilities siting and permitting policies to study the need to implement a uniform statewide policy regarding the siting and permitting of wind energy production facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. James Alesi [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-08 | PRINT NUMBER 785A | |
2010-02-08 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS | |
2009-01-15 | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10295 (Same As) 2010-03-17 - referred to energy