NY S00783 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the transitional green development program; provides for a two-year grant to be funded through the empire state development corporation not to exceed $150,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the transitional green development program; provides for a two-year grant to be funded through the empire state development corporation not to exceed $150,000.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01Assemblyreferred to economic development
2019-04-01SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-04-01SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-03-26SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 783A
2019-02-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-01-29Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-01-28Senate1ST REPORT CAL.66
2019-01-09SenateREFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback