NY S00772 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - SIGNED CHAP.706
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - SIGNED CHAP.706
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a blue alert system to aid in the identification, location and apprehension of any individuals suspected of killing or seriously wounding any police officer.
Title
Establishes a blue alert system to aid in the identification, location and apprehension of any individuals suspected of killing or seriously wounding any police officer.
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] |
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. John Mannion [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-16 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.706 |
2022-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.606 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | substituted for a6318b |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-02 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1847 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 772A |
2022-05-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A06318 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - substituted by s772a