NY S00760 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits reckless driving in parking lots.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits reckless driving in parking lots.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-15Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-04-15Assemblypassed assembly
2024-04-15Assemblyordered to third reading cal.399
2024-04-15Assemblysubstituted for a402b
2024-03-06Assemblyreferred to codes
2024-03-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-03-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-01-17SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-01-16Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-01-09Senate1ST REPORT CAL.115
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-06-06Assemblyreferred to codes
2023-06-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-05-30SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 760B
2023-05-09SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 760A
2023-05-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-05-03Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-05-02Senate1ST REPORT CAL.725
2023-01-06SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A00402 (Same As) 2024-04-15 - substituted by s760b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S760
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00760&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00760
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00760&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00760A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00760&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00760B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S760#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S760#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00760&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S760#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S760#SF2

Bill Comments

feedback