NY S00749 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - APPROVAL MEMO.30
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - APPROVAL MEMO.30
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Awards attorney's fees and expert witness fees in appropriate cases.
Title
Awards attorney's fees and expert witness fees in appropriate cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 103 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-03 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.30 |
2021-11-03 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.566 |
2021-10-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.72 |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | substituted for a1899 |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.209 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A01899 (Same As) 2021-05-20 - substituted by s749