NY S00749 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-23 - PRINT NUMBER 749B
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-23 - PRINT NUMBER 749B
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for tax credit for the adoption of household pets from animal shelters or humane societies; up to $100 per animal with a maximum of three household pets.
Title
Provides for tax credit for the adoption of household pets from animal shelters or humane societies; up to $100 per animal with a maximum of three household pets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 749B |
2018-02-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-05-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 749A |
2017-05-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2017-05-16 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A03875 (Same As) 2018-02-28 - print number 3875b