NY S00748 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-21 - SIGNED CHAP.380
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-21 - SIGNED CHAP.380
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides an exemption from jury duty for breastfeeding women; allows that such breastfeeding mother's jury duty shall be postponed up to two years after the date on which such service otherwise is to commence.
Title
Provides an exemption from jury duty for breastfeeding women; allows that such breastfeeding mother's jury duty shall be postponed up to two years after the date on which such service otherwise is to commence.
Sponsors
Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] |
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] | Sen. Julia Salazar [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.380 |
2019-10-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.518 |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | substituted for a5424 |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-02-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-02-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.136 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A05424 (Same As) 2019-10-21 - SIGNED CHAP.380