NY S00747 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the right of the people to bear and keep arms.
Title
Relates to the right of the people to bear and keep arms.
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. Thomas Croci [R] | Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] | Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] |
Sen. James Seward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-01-12 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-02-10 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-01-13 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A03274 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - held for consideration in codes