NY S00745 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the admissibility of a victim's outcry and disclosures in cases of sexual abuse regardless of when the disclosure was made relative to the abuse.
Title
Provides for the admissibility of a victim's outcry and disclosures in cases of sexual abuse regardless of when the disclosure was made relative to the abuse.
Sponsors
Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.861 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A03254 (Same As) 2022-11-18 - enacting clause stricken