NY S00745 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows community boards to apply and receive grants for waterfront revitalization programs for coastal areas and inland waterways, in the same manner that local governments currently do.
Title
Allows community boards to apply and receive grants for waterfront revitalization programs for coastal areas and inland waterways, in the same manner that local governments currently do.
Sponsors
Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2020-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.874 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-03-29 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-03-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-26 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.329 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-02-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 745A |
2019-02-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A03082 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to environmental conservation