NY S00725 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to access to mental health services for Medicaid eligible individuals up to 21 years of age who are referred to the pre-admission certification committee; requires commissioner to evaluate what services are needed and how to provide them.
Title
Relates to access to mental health services for Medicaid eligible individuals up to 21 years of age who are referred to the pre-admission certification committee; requires commissioner to evaluate what services are needed and how to provide them.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2017-06-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 725A |
2017-06-01 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2017-04-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A03751 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means