NY S00720 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the disqualification of a surviving spouse if the marriage is annulled or voided after the death of the spouse.
Title
Provides for the disqualification of a surviving spouse if the marriage is annulled or voided after the death of the spouse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2022-02-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-02-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.319 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2021-04-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-04-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.619 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.619 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A00487 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to judiciary