NY S00712 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - SIGNED CHAP.13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the authorization for the county of Greene to impose an additional mortgage recording tax until December 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends the authorization for the county of Greene to impose an additional mortgage recording tax until December 1, 2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 110 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15AssemblySIGNED CHAP.13
2019-02-04SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-01-29Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-01-29Assemblypassed assembly
2019-01-29Assemblyhome rule request
2019-01-29Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.13
2019-01-29Assemblysubstituted for a209
2019-01-29Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-01-29SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-01-29SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-01-29SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2019-01-28SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.82
2019-01-28SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-01-09SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A00209 (Same As) 2019-01-29 - substituted by s712

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback